Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Vidal Coleman - 222 Citation - Vidal Coleman - 222 |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Coleman, Vidal Served 09/04/2021 Response Due 09/27/2021 Returned 09/06/2021 | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Coleman, Vidal Unserved | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.