Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Robert M. Galvan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Galvan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Default Judgment Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service - Orion Drilling Company, LLC Return of Service - Orion Drilling Company, LLC |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Suggestion of Receivership Suggestion of Receivership |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Orion Drilling Company, LLC Served 08/18/2021 Response Due 09/13/2021 Returned 09/02/2021 | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Orion Drilling Company, LLC Unserved | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.