Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Nanette Hasette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNanette Hasette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Result: Held | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear - Sept. 08, 2021 @ 1:30pm Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear - Sept. 08, 2021 @ 1:30pm |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter Claim / Counter Petition Original Counterpetition for Divorce Original Counterpetition for Divorce |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Notice Of Hearing For Temporary Orders And Order To Appear Notice Of Hearing For Temporary Orders And Order To Appear |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Padilla, Lisa Marie Served 07/16/2021 Response Due 08/09/2021 Returned 07/20/2021 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet citation requested citation requested |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition For Divorce Original Petition For Divorce |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.