Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with David V. Stith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid V. Stith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) (1HR) (1HR) |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Carbajal-Bessette, Jarred Joseph Unserved | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause Carbajal-Bessette, Jarred Joseph Unserved | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Notice of Hearing For Temporary Orders Set 08/25/2021 @1:30pm Notice of Hearing For Temporary Orders Set 08/25/2021 @1:30pm |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Original Petition in Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship Original Petition in Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Nueces County Process Sheet Nueces County Process Sheet |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Notice of Hearing For Temporary Orders Notice of Hearing For Temporary Orders |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Incomplete BVS reporting form Incomplete BVS reporting form |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet Family Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.