Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Carlos Valdez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarlos Valdez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) TEMP ORD; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 09/08/2021 Reset by Court to 09/24/2021 09/24/2021 Reset by Court to 10/07/2021 TEMP ORD; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer And Original Counter-Petition For Divorce Respondent's Original Answer And Original Counter-Petition For Divorce |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service-LAURA DE LA GARZA/CITATION Return of Service-LAURA DE LA GARZA/CITATION |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service-LAURA DE LA GARZA/NOTICE OF HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE-1 Return of Service-LAURA DE LA GARZA/NOTICE OF HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE-1 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) TEMP ORD; VIA ZOOM Meeting ID: 956 9667 0454 Result: Reset TEMP ORD; VIA ZOOM Meeting ID: 956 9667 0454 |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders on August 18, 2021 @ 9:00 a.m. (signed) Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders on August 18, 2021 @ 9:00 a.m. (signed) |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause Delagarza, Laura Elizabeth Served 09/20/2021 Returned 09/21/2021 | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Delagarza, Laura Elizabeth Served 09/20/2021 Response Due 10/11/2021 Returned 09/21/2021 | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause Delagarza, Laura Elizabeth Unserved | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Delagarza, Laura Elizabeth Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.