Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Mary K. M. Medary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary K. M. Medary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:15 PM) () 07/21/2021 Reset by Court to 08/09/2021 Result: Reset | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Agreed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Agreed Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order Agreed Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/TRO - Nina J Hernandez Return of Service/TRO - Nina J Hernandez |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/Citation - Nina J Hernandez Return of Service/Citation - Nina J Hernandez |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Agreed Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order Agreed Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order - Family Hernandez, Nina J. Served 07/09/2021 Returned 07/20/2021 | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Hernandez, Nina J. Served 07/09/2021 Response Due 08/02/2021 Returned 07/20/2021 | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Temporary Restraining Order And Order Setting Hearing For Temporary Orders Temporary Restraining Order And Order Setting Hearing For Temporary Orders |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.