Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Robert M. Galvan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Galvan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) PROTECTIVE ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) Aguirre, Narciso, IV Served 07/26/2021 Returned 07/27/2021 | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC NCIC DATA ENTRY TCIC NCIC DATA ENTRY |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Temporary Ex Parte Order Order Extending Temporary Ex Parte Order |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Motion Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) PROTECTIVE ORDER Result: Reset PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.