Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Jack W. Pulcher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJack W. Pulcher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (2:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Pulcher, Jack W.) FINAL HEARING Result: Held | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce Without Children Affidavit Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce Without Children |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Pulcher, Jack W. ) Final Decree of Divorce Final Decree of Divorce |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Current Address Notice Notice of Current Address |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Samaniego, Celeste Yvette Served 06/22/2021 Response Due 07/19/2021 Returned 06/24/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.