Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Taylor, Meladee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Taylor, Loran, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Answer Petition For Clarification Of Property Division And For Order Of Sale |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Affidavit Of Service and Citation/Loran D. Taylor/served-1 |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Petition For Clarification Of Property Division And For Order Of Sale |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Suit in Suit (Disposed) Complaint For Partition Of Real Property |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin Vitals Form for Order Signed 08/30/2021 |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.