Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Nanette Hasette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNanette Hasette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Result: Held | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Divorce Hearing - September 08, 2021 @ 1:30pm Final Divorce Hearing - September 08, 2021 @ 1:30pm |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Final Decree Of Divorce Final Decree Of Divorce |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Parent Education Certificate Filed Certificate Of Completion Certificate Of Completion |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service of Service |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition For Divorce Original Petition For Divorce |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.