Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) Final (Pro Se) Final (Pro Se) |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Turner, Clarissa Nicole Served 06/22/2021 Response Due 07/19/2021 Returned 06/25/2021 | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Inability to Pay Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs or an Appeal Bond Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs or an Appeal Bond |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Final Decree of Divorce Final Decree of Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.