Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Korduba, Laryssa Maria, against Xxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulcher, Jack W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Pulcher, Jack W.) MOTION TO UNSEAL MOTION TO UNSEAL |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment of Judgment |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Unseal Order (Judicial Officer: Pulcher, Jack W. ) Order to Unseal |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order to Unseal Order to Unseal |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Unseal Motion Motion to Unseal |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer American General Life Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition American General Life Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer American General Life Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Pulcher, Jack W.) DECLATORY JUDGMENT Result: Reset DECLATORY JUDGMENT |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DECLATORY JUDGMENT |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing on Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment Approving Transfer of Annuity Payments Notice of Hearing on Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment Approving Transfer of Annuity Payments |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.