Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cox, Barbara, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Breunig, Spencer J, against Garcia, Alma, Garcia, David, represented by Alcantara, Ruben, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment of Judgment |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Agreed Judgment (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) Friendly Suit Goerge Picha Ad Litem Result: Held Friendly Suit Goerge Picha Ad Litem |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Friendly Suit Goerge Picha Ad Litem |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) Friendly suit Gerogr Picha Ad litem Friendly suit Gerogr Picha Ad litem |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Friendly suit Gerogr Picha Ad litem |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) friendly suit Result: Reset friendly suit |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) friendly suit |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Appointment Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem (George Picha) Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem (George Picha) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.