Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hernandez, Elias, Hernandez, Regina, Hernandez, Regyna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Desouza, Jason F, against Berry Contracting, Berry Contracting, Lp, Berry Gp, Inc., Berry Operating Company, Llc, Voestalpine, (total of 8) See All represented by Waterhouse, Richard B, Jr., Wilkins, Greg C., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Call (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) Pretrial Conference 5/30/21@9am, J.T. 5/31/21 @9am Pretrial Conference 5/30/21@9am, J.T. 5/31/21 @9am |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Change Of Firm Affiliation And Address Notice Notice Of Change Of Firm Affiliation And Address |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Reporter Certificate of Mike Hummell Reporter Certificate of Mike Hummell |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Reporter Certificate of Berry Operating Corp. Rep. Charles Vanaman Reporter Certificate of Berry Operating Corp. Rep. Charles Vanaman |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery (Medical Records Requested from Neurosurgery of Corpus Christi) Notice Notice of Delivery (Medical Records Requested from Neurosurgery of Corpus Christi) |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery (Billing Records Requested from Nova Medical Centers) Notice Notice of Delivery (Billing Records Requested from Nova Medical Centers) |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery (Billing Records Requested from Texas Precision Surgery Center) Notice Notice of Delivery (Billing Records Requested from Texas Precision Surgery Center) |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Re: Deposition by Written Questions to Custodian of Radiology Records re: Elias Hernandez from Nova Medical Centers Re: Deposition by Written Questions to Custodian of Radiology Records re: Elias Hernandez from Nova Medical Centers |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Judge re case settled at mediation Judge re case settled at mediation |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/Citation-Jose Ramos-1 Return of Service/Citation-Jose Ramos-1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.