Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gates, Linda Rose, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Nefford, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2020 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Petition for Grandparent Possession or Access Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Order on Petition for Grandparent Possession or Access |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order on Petition for Grandparent Possession or Access Order on Petition for Grandparent Possession or Access |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter to Judge to Judge |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Amicus Attorney Original Answer In Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship Amicus Attorney Original Answer In Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mini-Mediation Notice Notice of Mini-Mediation |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) status on Rule 11 agreement Fran Wilms admicus Result: Reset status on Rule 11 agreement Fran Wilms admicus |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) status on Rule 11 agreement Fran Wilms admicus |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) status on rule 11 agreement Fran Willms admicus Result: Reset status on rule 11 agreement Fran Willms admicus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.