Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schanen, Amie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cantu, Omar, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin Vitals Form for Divorce Decree signed on 10/26/20 Vitals Form for Divorce Decree signed on 10/26/20 |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) Notice Of Attorney General As Necassary Party And Change Of Payee Notice Of Attorney General As Necassary Party And Change Of Payee |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Wage Withholding (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Income Withholding Order Income Withholding Order |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Income Withholding Order Income Withholding Order |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Income Withholding Order |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Final Decree of Divorce Final Decree of Divorce |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Result: Other Motion for Entry of Final Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.