Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conn Appliances Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kitz, Nathanial D., against Alaniz Moreau, Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2019 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT HRG.; VIA ZOOM ID# 95404531602 |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Default Judgment Default Judgment (signed) |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Entry of Default Judgment | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Default Judgment |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Yvonne Alaniz Moreau |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Attorney Cover Letter |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Pllaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.