Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hoefker, Paul A, against Jimenez, Ana, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2019 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing and/or Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Default Judgment Default Order |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Hearing and/ or Dismissal for Want of Prosecution - September 30, 2020 @ 9am |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Amended- Final Hearing and/or Dismissal for Want of Prosecution - September 30, 2020 @ 9am |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Hearing and/or Dismissal for Want of Prosecution- March 26,2020 @ 9am |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Petitione's Motion for Entry of Default Order Pursuant to T.R.C.P. 736.7 |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Default Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.