Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hayes, Karine Elizabeth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Simpson, Ryan Scott, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Application for Protective Order Result: Held Application for Protective Order |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice Notice of Hearing |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Result: Held | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Order on Substitution (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Result: Held | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Order on Agreed Motion for Continuance Order on Agreed Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.