Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Linda Acosta, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Martinez, Adan Ramos, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC Data Entry-Extended Temporary Ex Parte PO |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order And Order Setting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.