Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Mario, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Amy Marie, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin for Order signed on 3/5/2020 |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) final hearing |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Service Request Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.