Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ornelas, Christina Angelica, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ayala, Jose, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Order Granting Non Suit |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Non Suit |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Nonsuit | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application P.O. |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attempted Service PO - Jose Ayala Jr |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Set 02/06/20 @1:30pm | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Exptending Ex Parte Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.