Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Montoya, Matthew Cody, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Leal, Daisy Jasmine, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Motion Motion to Withdraw as Counsel |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Withdraw (Stephen Giovannini) (signed) Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Order on Motion to Withdraw (Stephen Giovannini) (signed) |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) M2 MOD.; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 Result: Held M2 MOD.; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) M2 MOD; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 M2 MOD; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return Of Service/Temporary Restraining Order - Daisy Jasmine Leal Return Of Service/Temporary Restraining Order - Daisy Jasmine Leal |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return Of Service/Citation - Daisy Jasmine Leal Return Of Service/Citation - Daisy Jasmine Leal |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent Daisy Leal's Original Answer Respondent Daisy Leal's Original Answer |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order - Family Leal, Daisy Jasmine Served 04/30/2022 Returned 05/02/2022 | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Leal, Daisy Jasmine Served 04/30/2022 Response Due 05/16/2022 Returned 05/02/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.