Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair &Amp; Sampson, Llp, against Garcia, Alexander L., Garcia, Bertha A., Lee, Ok Ja, Lee, Young Jae, United States Of America, (total of 5) See All represented by Cowan, Chad W, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Orders of Sale NPDC Lee, Young Jae Served 12/01/2020 Returned 12/07/2020 NPDC |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) NPDC NPDC |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notices mailed to Young Jae Lee, Alexander L. Garcia and Bertha A. Garcia//DR Judgment Notices mailed to Young Jae Lee, Alexander L. Garcia and Bertha A. Garcia//DR |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notices mailed to Young Jae Lee, Alexander L. Garcia and Bertha A. Garcia//DR |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Judgment (signed) Judgment (signed) |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) TAX SUIT; VIA ZOOM ID#96025493621 Result: Held TAX SUIT; VIA ZOOM ID#96025493621 |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing TAX SUIT; VIA ZOOM ID#96025493621 |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Judgment (signed) |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address Certificate Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.