Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Worley, Preston, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James, Benjamin D, against Pena, Antonio, represented by Abernethy, William A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Preston Worley'S Motion To Dismiss Defendants |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | proposed order to dismiss | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Non-Jury 1 Day |
|
February 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | File All Documents for Pre-Trial Conference | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) | |
February 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Completion of Discovery | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Amendment of Pleadings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.