Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gomez Juarez, Sharon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Juarez, Ruben, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS for Order Signed 09/13/2017 |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree Of Divorce |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order August 8,2017 @ 10am |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request DCC |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition First Amended Original Petition For Divorce And Request For Disclosures |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.