Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bell, Kristine, Hinojosa, Eziquiel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hinojosa, Eziquiel, Hinojosa, Kristine Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) mtn for new trial |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Nonsuit |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response Kristine Bell's Response To Ezekiel Hinojosa's |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for New Trial | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Agreed Order Agreed Final Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Motion to enter orders -15 minutes |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation for Settlement Agreement | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Respondent's Certificate of Written Discovery Responses Directed to Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.