Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Varela-Cruz, Lisbet Karina, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Sosa, Irene, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulcher, Jack W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Non-Suit | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Non-Suit |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Nonsuit Motion for Non-Suit |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDC Subpoena issued on 1/30/17 to Officer R. Hernandez #11389 returned served by CN1. |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order (Signed) | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.