Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aufegger, Melissa Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Moreno, David, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulcher, Jack W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Bill of Costs |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDC Subpoena issued to Officer Daniel J. Tovar #1915, CCPD on 1/17/17. Returned served by CN1 |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDC Subpoena issued to Officer M. Wertanen, CCPD on 1/17/17. Returned served by CN1 |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Signed (OCA) Protective Order |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Notice of App of PO - David Moreno |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.