Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castillo-Jimenez, Maria Margarita, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bent, Rob Lee, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment notice |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROT. ORD. |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Agreed Protective Order (Signed) |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center copy of order sent to CCPD 1/25/16 CA |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order (Signed) | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders PROT. ORD. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order (Signed) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.