Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carranza, Thomas C, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carranza, Norma A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form for Order Signed on 08/11/2017 |
|
August 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice judgment notice |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.