Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reynolds, Billie J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mohamed, Ahmed Aly Daoud, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form for Order Signed on 03/02/2017 |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice judgment notice |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Decree of Divorce |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service By Posting |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.