Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Munoz, Ramiro, Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Munoz, Claudia Navarro, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin VITAL FORM FOR DIVORCE, SIGNED 02/21/2019 |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROVE-UP |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce (signed) |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No service Requested |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.