Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Shawn Lee, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Huape, Mark Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Application For A Protective Order | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective ORder | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC Form |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.