Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Osborn, Kent Ray, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Osborn, Joann Regina, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form for Order Signed on 04/20/2017 |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Decree of Divorce |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING (DIVORCE CLINIC CASES | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Waiver Of Citation | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.