Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Madden, Laura Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marek, James, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS for Order signed on 4/10/2017 |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Final Divorce Decree |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Notice of Setting: Final Hearing 4/10/17 @ 9AM |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service Only | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.