Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mariano, Joseph, Revilla, Daniela, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mariano, Joseph, Revilla, Daniela, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) () 09/14/2021 Reset by Court to 11/17/2021 Result: Held | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order of Termination Order of Termination |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) () | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (1:15 PM) () | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Confirming Termination Hearing date 8/30/2021 to 09/14/2021 Confirming Termination Hearing date 8/30/2021 to 09/14/2021 |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order of Termination Order of Termination |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended First Amended Counterpetition To Modify Parent-Child Relationship And Termination Of' Parent-Child Relationship First Amended Counterpetition To Modify Parent-Child Relationship And Termination Of' Parent-Child Relationship |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Motion Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order on Motion for Withdrawal Counsel Order on Motion for Withdrawal Counsel |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Status Hearing (OCA) (1:15 PM) () |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.