Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Umberson, Jennifer, Umberson, Toby, Jr., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anderson, David M, Carrigan, Stephen P, against Ferrell, Bruce Clayton, Womack, James, represented by Abernethy, William A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2014 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment And/Or Dismissal |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant James L. Womack's Original Answer |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Officer's Certification and Notice of Delivery |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Officer's Certification and Notice of Delivery |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Affidavit of Service for James L. Womack |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Reporters Certification Oral Deposition of Bruce Clayton Ferrell |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.