Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hayes, Karine, Simpson, Ryan Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hayes, Karine, Simpson, Ryan Scott, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Motion for Entry of Orders Result: Held Motion for Entry of Orders |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Agreed Amended Order of Termination and Release of Child Support Arrearages and Release of all Judgments Owed by Ryan Simpson in this Cause Agreed Amended Order of Termination and Release of Child Support Arrearages and Release of all Judgments Owed by Ryan Simpson in this Cause |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Order of Termination and Release of Child Support Arrearages Any Release Of All Judgments Owed By Ryan Simpson In This Cause Order of Termination and Release of Child Support Arrearages Any Release Of All Judgments Owed By Ryan Simpson In This Cause |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Confirmation letter Confirmation letter |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) 08/11/2021 Reset by Court to 08/30/2021 Result: Held | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter Claim / Counter Petition Counterpetition In Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship And To Terminate Parent-Child Relationship Counterpetition In Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship And To Terminate Parent-Child Relationship |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Other CANCELED Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Other Half-Day |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Half-Day Half-Day |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Atty. Miller's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Motion to Enter TO Result: Held Atty. Miller's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Motion to Enter TO |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Karine Hayes' Exhibit List Karine Hayes' Exhibit List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.