Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mckinney, Melissa A, against The Unknown Heirs At Law Of Sylvester Savala, Jr., Woods, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice DWOP Notice Sent |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Copy Publisher's Affidavit |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Publisher's Affidavit |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion For Appointment of Attorney AD Litem |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.