Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salazar, Krystalene Andrade, Salazar, Minerva, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Rodriguez, Mynor "Eddie", against Compton, Karen, Gould, Keith M., Paul D. Andrews P.C., Andrews, Paul D, Wood, Michael, (total of 14) See All represented by Sterba Boatwright, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Call (Trial: October 26th, 2015) | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Pre-Trial |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice Of Judgment and/or Dimissal |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Defendant Montessori Association of South Texas, DBA Corpus Christi Montessori School's Notice of Removal to Federal Court Mailed | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Status / Settlement Conference (Trial: October 26th, 2015) |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Defendant Montessori Association of South Texas, DBA Corpus Christi Montessori School's Notice of Removal to Federal Court |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice to State Court of Removal | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Vacation Schedule Sandra Sterba-Boatwright |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.