Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmc Specialty Mortgage, Llc, Wm Specialty Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jacocks, Coury M, Waddell, Anthony C., against Mcgowan, Jeffrey A., Mcgowan, Roberta J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Home Equity Foreclosure Order |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Designation of Attorney in Charge |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Petitioner's Texas Rules of Civil Procedure 736 Home Equity Foreclosure |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer via fax |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation - Foreclosure | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Tex. Rule Civ. P. 736 Application for Home Equity Foreclosure Order |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter with service instructions |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet service requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.