Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Longoria, Belinda De La Fuente, Longoria, Ross, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lee, Allen C., against Saenz, Rosalinda, represented by Garcia, Gene A., Martinez, Reynaldo, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Court Reporters Exhibit List |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) MTN FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Copy of Texas Supreme Court First Emergency Order |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs' Exparte Motion For Injunctiontive Relief |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Continuing Injunctive Relief And Setting Hearing For Other Matters |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for New Trial | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mandate from COA: Please be advised that we have on this date issued the attached mandate in the above cause |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.