Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Susser Petroleum Company Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Henkel, C M, Iii, against 2S & J Investment Group Llc, Grewal, Sherjeet, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulcher, Jack W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment - Out of County | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested (Amended Writ of Attachment) |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment - In County | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Request Writ of Attachment |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Order for Contempt | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Contempt Judgment) | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION FOR CONTEMPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.