Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mckinney, Melissa A, against Benavidez, Andrea, Benavidez, Andrew, Benavidez, Austin, Benavidez, Leann M., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (Signed) | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket DWOP |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Court's Own Motion and Notice Of Hearing For Dismissal For Want Of Proseciution |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Court's Own Motion and Notice Of Hearing For Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Court's Own Motion and Notice Of Hearing For Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice Sent | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 326302 AFFIDAVIT |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Designation Of Attorney In Charge/kc**efiled** | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Original Citation returned for Leann M Benavidez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.