Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mounger, Gloria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Munoz, Oscar Alvarado, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Iron Horse Tools, represented by Lane, Veronica J, Rangel, Carolyn K, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (signed) | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiffs' Notice Of Filing Of Nonsuit With Prejudice |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant's Motion to Enter Settlement |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Fiat |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer Defendants Iron Horse Tools, LLC and Oscar Alvarado Munoz's First Amended Original Answer, First Amended Special Exceptions And Motion To Abate **e-filed** |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting Defendants Iron Horse Tools,LLC and Oscar Alvarado Munoz's Motion to Compel (I) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.