Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Qazi, Naved U. filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Garza, Lina Monique, represented by George, Michael D, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Final Judgment |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Order -- Appointing Michael George as Attorney for Defendant | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested (Svc pack to svc 1/22/15 /AT) |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Order on State's Motion For Substitute Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.