Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Enriquez, Nichole Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Enriquez, Valdomore, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hernandez, Angelica presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHernandez, Angelica Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Envelope Returned Undelivered In Re: Bill of Costs |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Protective Order |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order extending ex parte protective order |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Temporary Protective Order/order attached, walked to court |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Protective Order | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order I/Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order & Order Setting Hearing 1/3 @ 1:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.