Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Panzullo, Lisa Anne, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Locascio, Lori Marie, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Mediated Settelment Agreement (per Kelly Koch) |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. (contested) |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order/walkd to court by aEsmer | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) An Application for a Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.