Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Delgado, Mary Jane, Delgado, Noe Martinez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Delgado, Mary Jane, Delgado, Noe Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Order Granting Nonsuit & Order Granting Name Change |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Nonsuit and Order Granting Name Change |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting New Trial (OCA) | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Order on Motion for New Trial |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Motion for New Trial |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Return of Service |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Precept |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.